Skyline Drifter Posted February 27, 2017 Share Posted February 27, 2017 (edited) 30/01/10 - Gary Jardine (Edinburgh City) (initially as co-manager, sole charge from 31/05/12) 07/10/11 - Jim McInally (Peterhead) 13/01/13 - Jim Chapman (Annan Athletic) 30/01/13 - Alan Archibald (Partick Thistle) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 22/03/13) 07/04/13 - Derek McInnes (Aberdeen) (officially confirmed 25/03/13 but didn't take charge for a fortnight) 10/06/13 - Tommy Wright (St Johnstone) 22/01/14 - Gus MacPherson (Queen's Park) 05/02/14 - Paul Hartley (Dundee) 19/05/14 - Jim Duffy (Morton) 10/06/14 - Darren Young (Albion Rovers) 12/06/14 - Peter Houston (Falkirk) 09/09/14 - Jim McIntyre (Ross County) 27/11/14 - Jim Weir (Elgin City) 05/01/15 - Ian McCall (Ayr United) 09/01/15 - Martin Canning (Hamilton Academical) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 23/01/15) 01/02/15 - Brown Ferguson (Stenhousemuir) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed on 02/04/15 to be manager from start of 2015/16 season!) 08/05/15 - Allan Johnston (Dunfermline Athletic) 27/05/15 - Stephen Aitken (Dumbarton) 10/06/15 - Darren Dods (Brechin City) 06/11/15 - John Coughlin (Berwick Rangers) 21/12/15 - Gary Bollan (Forfar Athletic) 21/12/15 - David Hopkin (Livingston) (Caretaker initially, officially confirmed 05/01/16) 08/03/16 - Dick Campbell (Arbroath) 13/05/16 - Ray McKinnon (Dundee United) 20/05/16 - Brendan Rogers (Celtic) 30/05/16 - Richie Foran (Inverness CT) 09/06/16 - Neil Lennon (Hibernian) 04/10/16 - Jack Ross (St Mirren) 11/10/16 - Jim Goodwin (Alloa Athletic) 31/10/16 - Mark Wilson (Airdrieonians) 09/11/16 - Dave McKay (Stirling Albion) 04/12/16 - Stewart Petrie (Montrose) 05/12/16 - Ian Cathro (Heart of Midlothian) 06/12/16 - Gary Naysmith (Queen of the South) 12/12/16 - Barry Smith (East Fife) 23/01/17 - Stevie Farrell (Stranraer) 10/02/17 - John Hughes (Raith Rovers) Vacant - Rangers (Mark Warburton resigned or pushed (take your pick) 10/02/17, Graeme Murty in caretaker charge) Vacant - Kilmarnock (Lee Clark departed for Bury 15/02/17, Lee McCulloch in caretaker charge) Vacant - Clyde (Barry Ferguson resigned 25/02/17. Bob Malcolm in caretaker charge) Vacant - Motherwell (Mark McGhee sacked 28/02/17. Stephen Robinson in caretaker charge) Vacant - Cowdenbeath (Liam Fox resigned 06/03/17. No confirmation of caretaker. Edited March 9, 2017 by Skyline Drifter 0 Quote Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
German Jag Posted February 28, 2017 Share Posted February 28, 2017 On 27.2.2017 at 17:20, Skyline Drifter said: Vacant - Rangers (Mark Warburton resigned or pushed (take your pick) 10/03/17, Graeme Murty in caretaker charge) Vacant - Kilmarnock (Lee Clark departed for Bury 15/03/17, Lee McCulloch in caretaker charge) Your time-machine is a month out! 0 Quote Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Skyline Drifter Posted February 28, 2017 Share Posted February 28, 2017 1 minute ago, German Jag said: Your time-machine is a month out! Oops. One might be a typo. Two is either awful typing or moronic incompetence! 0 Quote Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
The Minertaur Posted March 7, 2017 Share Posted March 7, 2017 Liam Fox resigned as Cowden manager last night. Onto our 4th manager in 3 seasons unless we hire Nicholl or Nish! 0 Quote Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Skyline Drifter Posted March 10, 2017 Share Posted March 10, 2017 (edited) 30/01/10 - Gary Jardine (Edinburgh City) (initially as co-manager, sole charge from 31/05/12) 07/10/11 - Jim McInally (Peterhead) 13/01/13 - Jim Chapman (Annan Athletic) 30/01/13 - Alan Archibald (Partick Thistle) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 22/03/13) 07/04/13 - Derek McInnes (Aberdeen) (officially confirmed 25/03/13 but didn't take charge for a fortnight) 10/06/13 - Tommy Wright (St Johnstone) 22/01/14 - Gus MacPherson (Queen's Park) 05/02/14 - Paul Hartley (Dundee) 19/05/14 - Jim Duffy (Morton) 10/06/14 - Darren Young (Albion Rovers) 12/06/14 - Peter Houston (Falkirk) 09/09/14 - Jim McIntyre (Ross County) 27/11/14 - Jim Weir (Elgin City) 05/01/15 - Ian McCall (Ayr United) 09/01/15 - Martin Canning (Hamilton Academical) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 23/01/15) 01/02/15 - Brown Ferguson (Stenhousemuir) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed on 02/04/15 to be manager from start of 2015/16 season!) 08/05/15 - Allan Johnston (Dunfermline Athletic) 27/05/15 - Stephen Aitken (Dumbarton) 10/06/15 - Darren Dods (Brechin City) 06/11/15 - John Coughlin (Berwick Rangers) 21/12/15 - Gary Bollan (Forfar Athletic) 21/12/15 - David Hopkin (Livingston) (Caretaker initially, officially confirmed 05/01/16) 08/03/16 - Dick Campbell (Arbroath) 13/05/16 - Ray McKinnon (Dundee United) 20/05/16 - Brendan Rogers (Celtic) 30/05/16 - Richie Foran (Inverness CT) 09/06/16 - Neil Lennon (Hibernian) 04/10/16 - Jack Ross (St Mirren) 11/10/16 - Jim Goodwin (Alloa Athletic) 31/10/16 - Mark Wilson (Airdrieonians) 09/11/16 - Dave McKay (Stirling Albion) 04/12/16 - Stewart Petrie (Montrose) 05/12/16 - Ian Cathro (Heart of Midlothian) 06/12/16 - Gary Naysmith (Queen of the South) 12/12/16 - Barry Smith (East Fife) 23/01/17 - Stevie Farrell (Stranraer) 10/02/17 - John Hughes (Raith Rovers) 28/02/17 - Stephen Robinson (Motherwell) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 15/03/17) 08/03/17 - JP McGovern & Peter MacDonald (Joint Managers) (Clyde) 10/03/17 - Gary Locke (Cowdenbeath) 11/03/17 - Pedro Caixinha (Rangers) Vacant - Kilmarnock (Lee Clark departed for Bury 15/02/17, Lee McCulloch in caretaker charge) Edited March 15, 2017 by Skyline Drifter 0 Quote Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Guest Posted March 10, 2017 Share Posted March 10, 2017 JP McGovern and Peter MacDonald in charge of Clyde until the end of the season 0 Quote Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
The Master Posted April 30, 2017 Share Posted April 30, 2017 @Skyline Drifter Just noticed this is needing updated; Paul Hartley departed Dundee on 17/4/17; Neil McCann in interim charge from 18/4/17. 0 Quote Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Skyline Drifter Posted May 2, 2017 Share Posted May 2, 2017 On 30/04/2017 at 23:55, The Master said: @Skyline Drifter Just noticed this is needing updated; Paul Hartley departed Dundee on 17/4/17; Neil McCann in interim charge from 18/4/17. Yeah, it's not up to date. Was out of the office all week last week and then family illness at the weekend meant I never had a chance. Will update now. 0 Quote Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Skyline Drifter Posted May 2, 2017 Share Posted May 2, 2017 (edited) 30/01/10 - Gary Jardine (Edinburgh City) (initially as co-manager, sole charge from 31/05/12) 07/10/11 - Jim McInally (Peterhead) 13/01/13 - Jim Chapman (Annan Athletic) 30/01/13 - Alan Archibald (Partick Thistle) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 22/03/13) 07/04/13 - Derek McInnes (Aberdeen) (officially confirmed 25/03/13 but didn't take charge for a fortnight) 10/06/13 - Tommy Wright (St Johnstone) 22/01/14 - Gus MacPherson (Queen's Park) 19/05/14 - Jim Duffy (Morton) 12/06/14 - Peter Houston (Falkirk) 09/09/14 - Jim McIntyre (Ross County) 27/11/14 - Jim Weir (Elgin City) 05/01/15 - Ian McCall (Ayr United) 09/01/15 - Martin Canning (Hamilton Academical) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 23/01/15) 01/02/15 - Brown Ferguson (Stenhousemuir) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed on 02/04/15 to be manager from start of 2015/16 season!) 08/05/15 - Allan Johnston (Dunfermline Athletic) 27/05/15 - Stephen Aitken (Dumbarton) 10/06/15 - Darren Dods (Brechin City) 06/11/15 - John Coughlin (Berwick Rangers) 21/12/15 - Gary Bollan (Forfar Athletic) 21/12/15 - David Hopkin (Livingston) (Caretaker initially, officially confirmed 05/01/16) 08/03/16 - Dick Campbell (Arbroath) 13/05/16 - Ray McKinnon (Dundee United) 20/05/16 - Brendan Rogers (Celtic) 30/05/16 - Richie Foran (Inverness CT) 09/06/16 - Neil Lennon (Hibernian) 04/10/16 - Jack Ross (St Mirren) 11/10/16 - Jim Goodwin (Alloa Athletic) 31/10/16 - Mark Wilson (Airdrieonians) 09/11/16 - Dave McKay (Stirling Albion) 04/12/16 - Stewart Petrie (Montrose) 05/12/16 - Ian Cathro (Heart of Midlothian) 06/12/16 - Gary Naysmith (Queen of the South) 12/12/16 - Barry Smith (East Fife) 23/01/17 - Stevie Farrell (Stranraer) 15/02/17 - Lee McCulloch (Kilmarnock) (caretaker in theory) 28/02/17 - Stephen Robinson (Motherwell) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 15/03/17) 08/03/17 - JP McGovern & Peter MacDonald (Joint Managers) (Clyde) 10/03/17 - Gary Locke (Cowdenbeath) 11/03/17 - Pedro Caixinha (Rangers) 18/04/17 - Neil McCann (Dundee) 08/05/17 - Brian Kerr (Albion Rovers) Vacant - Raith Rovers (John Hughes departed following relegation on 13th May. No caretaker as far as I know with no games imminent) Neil McCann's appointment for Dundee in place of Hartley. I've listed him as a proper Manager rather than as a caretaker as there isn't the possibility of him being replaced at any moment. In the same way McGovern & MacDonald at Clyde and (now) Lee McCulloch at Kilmarnock. Edited to add: Darren Young replaced at Albion Rovers by Brian Kerr at the end of the season Edited to add: John Hughes gone from Raith. Rumours that Dick Campbell will leave Arbroath to take over are unconfirmed for now. Edited May 19, 2017 by Skyline Drifter 0 Quote Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Skyline Drifter Posted May 20, 2017 Share Posted May 20, 2017 30/01/10 - Gary Jardine (Edinburgh City) (initially as co-manager, sole charge from 31/05/12) 07/10/11 - Jim McInally (Peterhead) 30/01/13 - Alan Archibald (Partick Thistle) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 22/03/13) 07/04/13 - Derek McInnes (Aberdeen) (officially confirmed 25/03/13 but didn't take charge for a fortnight) 10/06/13 - Tommy Wright (St Johnstone) 22/01/14 - Gus MacPherson (Queen's Park) 19/05/14 - Jim Duffy (Morton) 12/06/14 - Peter Houston (Falkirk) 09/09/14 - Jim McIntyre (Ross County) 27/11/14 - Jim Weir (Elgin City) 05/01/15 - Ian McCall (Ayr United) 09/01/15 - Martin Canning (Hamilton Academical) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 23/01/15) 01/02/15 - Brown Ferguson (Stenhousemuir) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed on 02/04/15 to be manager from start of 2015/16 season!) 08/05/15 - Allan Johnston (Dunfermline Athletic) 27/05/15 - Stephen Aitken (Dumbarton) 10/06/15 - Darren Dods (Brechin City) 06/11/15 - John Coughlin (Berwick Rangers) 21/12/15 - Gary Bollan (Forfar Athletic) 21/12/15 - David Hopkin (Livingston) (Caretaker initially, officially confirmed 05/01/16) 08/03/16 - Dick Campbell (Arbroath) 13/05/16 - Ray McKinnon (Dundee United) 20/05/16 - Brendan Rogers (Celtic) 30/05/16 - Richie Foran (Inverness CT) 09/06/16 - Neil Lennon (Hibernian) 04/10/16 - Jack Ross (St Mirren) 11/10/16 - Jim Goodwin (Alloa Athletic) 31/10/16 - Mark Wilson (Airdrieonians) 09/11/16 - Dave McKay (Stirling Albion) 04/12/16 - Stewart Petrie (Montrose) 05/12/16 - Ian Cathro (Heart of Midlothian) 06/12/16 - Gary Naysmith (Queen of the South) 12/12/16 - Barry Smith (East Fife) 23/01/17 - Stevie Farrell (Stranraer) 15/02/17 - Lee McCulloch (Kilmarnock) (caretaker in theory) 28/02/17 - Stephen Robinson (Motherwell) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 15/03/17) 10/03/17 - Gary Locke (Cowdenbeath) 11/03/17 - Pedro Caixinha (Rangers) 18/04/17 - Neil McCann (Dundee) 08/05/17 - Brian Kerr (Albion Rovers) 29/05/17 - Jim Chapman (Clyde) Vacant - Raith Rovers (John Hughes departed following relegation on 13th May. No caretaker as far as I know with no games imminent) Vacant - Annan Athletic (Jim Chapman appointed Clyde manager on 20th May albeit not taking up duties there until 29th May. Presumably no caretaker as off season). New post as there had been too many amendments to the last one. Jim Chapman has left Annan Athletic today (20th May) to join Clyde as manager albeit he has now gone on holiday and doesn't officially start at Clyde until 29th May. No idea if McGovern and MacDonald who had been caretaker managers at Clyde will go back to being just players or are leaving. Annan are presumably now managerless for the time being. I presume Chapman will take Joyce with him and Annan have no games imminently. 0 Quote Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Skyline Drifter Posted May 30, 2017 Share Posted May 30, 2017 (edited) 30/01/10 - Gary Jardine (Edinburgh City) (initially as co-manager, sole charge from 31/05/12) 07/10/11 - Jim McInally (Peterhead) 30/01/13 - Alan Archibald (Partick Thistle) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 22/03/13) 07/04/13 - Derek McInnes (Aberdeen) (officially confirmed 25/03/13 but didn't take charge for a fortnight) 10/06/13 - Tommy Wright (St Johnstone) 22/01/14 - Gus MacPherson (Queen's Park) 19/05/14 - Jim Duffy (Morton) 12/06/14 - Peter Houston (Falkirk) 09/09/14 - Jim McIntyre (Ross County) 27/11/14 - Jim Weir (Elgin City) 05/01/15 - Ian McCall (Ayr United) 09/01/15 - Martin Canning (Hamilton Academical) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 23/01/15) 01/02/15 - Brown Ferguson (Stenhousemuir) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed on 02/04/15 to be manager from start of 2015/16 season!) 08/05/15 - Allan Johnston (Dunfermline Athletic) 27/05/15 - Stephen Aitken (Dumbarton) 10/06/15 - Darren Dods (Brechin City) 06/11/15 - John Coughlin (Berwick Rangers) 21/12/15 - Gary Bollan (Forfar Athletic) 21/12/15 - David Hopkin (Livingston) (Caretaker initially, officially confirmed 05/01/16) 08/03/16 - Dick Campbell (Arbroath) 13/05/16 - Ray McKinnon (Dundee United) 20/05/16 - Brendan Rogers (Celtic) 09/06/16 - Neil Lennon (Hibernian) 04/10/16 - Jack Ross (St Mirren) 11/10/16 - Jim Goodwin (Alloa Athletic) 31/10/16 - Mark Wilson (Airdrieonians) 09/11/16 - Dave McKay (Stirling Albion) 04/12/16 - Stewart Petrie (Montrose) 05/12/16 - Ian Cathro (Heart of Midlothian) 06/12/16 - Gary Naysmith (Queen of the South) 23/01/17 - Stevie Farrell (Stranraer) 15/02/17 - Lee McCulloch (Kilmarnock) (caretaker in theory) 28/02/17 - Stephen Robinson (Motherwell) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 15/03/17) 10/03/17 - Gary Locke (Cowdenbeath) 11/03/17 - Pedro Caixinha (Rangers) 18/04/17 - Neil McCann (Dundee) (technically left position between 29/05/17 & 01/06/17) 08/05/17 - Brian Kerr (Albion Rovers) 29/05/17 - Jim Chapman (Clyde) 30/05/17 - Barry Smith (Raith Rovers) 02/06/17 - Peter Murphy (Annan Athletic) Vacant - East Fife (Barry Smith joined Raith Rovers, no word on a caretaker) Vacant - Inverness Caledonian Thistle (Richie Foran sacked on 29th May. No word on a caretaker) Big Update Barry Smith has left East Fife after 6 months in charge to take the Raith Rovers job. Meanwhile Inverness have sacked Richie Foran and Dundee have confirmed Neil McCann's temporary stint in charge has come to an end and they are looking for someone else. Annan remain managerless also. So far as I am aware none of these clubs have announced a caretaker, though with the season over and players on holiday it's pretty irrelevant at this stage. Updated Again So, what to do with Dundee now McCann completes a u turn and goes back? Given nobody else had the job in between I have put him back in from tbe original date of his temporary appointment. He did leave the club for 5 days though so there is a legitimate argument that the clock should reset though. And updated again for Annan's appointment of Peter Murphy. Edited June 3, 2017 by Skyline Drifter 0 Quote Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Skyline Drifter Posted June 3, 2017 Share Posted June 3, 2017 (edited) 30/01/10 - Gary Jardine (Edinburgh City) (initially as co-manager, sole charge from 31/05/12) 07/10/11 - Jim McInally (Peterhead) 30/01/13 - Alan Archibald (Partick Thistle) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 22/03/13) 07/04/13 - Derek McInnes (Aberdeen) (officially confirmed 25/03/13 but didn't take charge for a fortnight) 10/06/13 - Tommy Wright (St Johnstone) 22/01/14 - Gus MacPherson (Queen's Park) 19/05/14 - Jim Duffy (Morton) 12/06/14 - Peter Houston (Falkirk) 09/09/14 - Jim McIntyre (Ross County) 27/11/14 - Jim Weir (Elgin City) 05/01/15 - Ian McCall (Ayr United) 09/01/15 - Martin Canning (Hamilton Academical) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 23/01/15) 01/02/15 - Brown Ferguson (Stenhousemuir) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed on 02/04/15 to be manager from start of 2015/16 season!) 08/05/15 - Allan Johnston (Dunfermline Athletic) 27/05/15 - Stephen Aitken (Dumbarton) 10/06/15 - Darren Dods (Brechin City) 06/11/15 - John Coughlin (Berwick Rangers) 21/12/15 - Gary Bollan (Forfar Athletic) 21/12/15 - David Hopkin (Livingston) (Caretaker initially, officially confirmed 05/01/16) 08/03/16 - Dick Campbell (Arbroath) 13/05/16 - Ray McKinnon (Dundee United) 20/05/16 - Brendan Rogers (Celtic) 09/06/16 - Neil Lennon (Hibernian) 04/10/16 - Jack Ross (St Mirren) 11/10/16 - Jim Goodwin (Alloa Athletic) 31/10/16 - Mark Wilson (Airdrieonians) 09/11/16 - Dave McKay (Stirling Albion) 04/12/16 - Stewart Petrie (Montrose) 05/12/16 - Ian Cathro (Heart of Midlothian) 06/12/16 - Gary Naysmith (Queen of the South) 23/01/17 - Stevie Farrell (Stranraer) 15/02/17 - Lee McCulloch (Kilmarnock) (caretaker in theory) 28/02/17 - Stephen Robinson (Motherwell) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 15/03/17) 10/03/17 - Gary Locke (Cowdenbeath) 11/03/17 - Pedro Caixinha (Rangers) 18/04/17 - Neil McCann (Dundee) (technically left position between 29/05/17 & 01/06/17) 08/05/17 - Brian Kerr (Albion Rovers) 29/05/17 - Jim Chapman (Clyde) 30/05/17 - Barry Smith (Raith Rovers) 02/06/17 - Peter Murphy (Annan Athletic) 03/06/17 - Darren Young (East Fife) 14/06/17 - John Robertson (Inverness Caledonian Thistle) Updated for the appointment of Darren Young at East Fife which leaves Inverness CT as the only managerless club now after Dundee, Raith, Annan and East Fife all filled vacancies in the last 4 days. Updated again for John Robertson's appointment at Inverness. This means there are no current vacancies though it appears likely Derek McInnes will shortly depart Aberdeen for Sunderland. Edited June 15, 2017 by Skyline Drifter 0 Quote Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Skyline Drifter Posted June 18, 2017 Share Posted June 18, 2017 (edited) 30/01/10 - Gary Jardine (Edinburgh City) (initially as co-manager, sole charge from 31/05/12) 07/10/11 - Jim McInally (Peterhead) 30/01/13 - Alan Archibald (Partick Thistle) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 22/03/13) 07/04/13 - Derek McInnes (Aberdeen) (officially confirmed 25/03/13 but didn't take charge for a fortnight) 10/06/13 - Tommy Wright (St Johnstone) 22/01/14 - Gus MacPherson (Queen's Park) 19/05/14 - Jim Duffy (Morton) 12/06/14 - Peter Houston (Falkirk) 09/09/14 - Jim McIntyre (Ross County) 27/11/14 - Jim Weir (Elgin City) 05/01/15 - Ian McCall (Ayr United) 09/01/15 - Martin Canning (Hamilton Academical) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 23/01/15) 01/02/15 - Brown Ferguson (Stenhousemuir) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed on 02/04/15 to be manager from start of 2015/16 season!) 08/05/15 - Allan Johnston (Dunfermline Athletic) 27/05/15 - Stephen Aitken (Dumbarton) 10/06/15 - Darren Dods (Brechin City) 21/12/15 - Gary Bollan (Forfar Athletic) 21/12/15 - David Hopkin (Livingston) (Caretaker initially, officially confirmed 05/01/16) 08/03/16 - Dick Campbell (Arbroath) 13/05/16 - Ray McKinnon (Dundee United) 20/05/16 - Brendan Rogers (Celtic) 09/06/16 - Neil Lennon (Hibernian) 04/10/16 - Jack Ross (St Mirren) 11/10/16 - Jim Goodwin (Alloa Athletic) 09/11/16 - Dave McKay (Stirling Albion) 04/12/16 - Stewart Petrie (Montrose) 06/12/16 - Gary Naysmith (Queen of the South) 23/01/17 - Stevie Farrell (Stranraer) 15/02/17 - Lee McCulloch (Kilmarnock) (caretaker in theory) 28/02/17 - Stephen Robinson (Motherwell) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 15/03/17) 11/03/17 - Pedro Caixinha (Rangers) 18/04/17 - Neil McCann (Dundee) (technically left position between 29/05/17 & 01/06/17) 08/05/17 - Brian Kerr (Albion Rovers) 29/05/17 - Jim Chapman (Clyde) 30/05/17 - Barry Smith (Raith Rovers) 02/06/17 - Peter Murphy (Annan Athletic) 03/06/17 - Darren Young (East Fife) 14/06/17 - John Robertson (Inverness Caledonian Thistle) 01/07/17 - Billy Brown (Cowdenbeath) Vacant - Airdrieonians (Mark Wilson left by "mutual consent" on 17/06/17) Vacant - Hearts (Ian Cathro sacked on 01/08/17. John Daly in caretaker charge) Vacant - Berwick Rangers (John Coughlin departed by mutual consent on 22/08/17) New post to note the departure of Mark Wilson from Airdrie after just over 7 months in charge. May or may not be related to the departure of the Chairman a week ago. Updated for the surprise departure of Gary Locke after just 4 months at Cowdenbeath. Billy Brown immediately installed as his replacement. Updated for the departure of Ian Cathro from Hearts. Updated for John Coughlin's departure from Berwick. Two months on Airdrie still don't have a new manager whilst Hearts apparently expect an appointment imminently. Edited August 23, 2017 by Skyline Drifter 0 Quote Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Skyline Drifter Posted August 29, 2017 Share Posted August 29, 2017 (edited) 30/01/10 - Gary Jardine (Edinburgh City) (initially as co-manager, sole charge from 31/05/12) 07/10/11 - Jim McInally (Peterhead) 30/01/13 - Alan Archibald (Partick Thistle) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 22/03/13) 07/04/13 - Derek McInnes (Aberdeen) (officially confirmed 25/03/13 but didn't take charge for a fortnight) 10/06/13 - Tommy Wright (St Johnstone) 22/01/14 - Gus MacPherson (Queen's Park) 19/05/14 - Jim Duffy (Morton) 09/09/14 - Jim McIntyre (Ross County) 27/11/14 - Jim Weir (Elgin City) 05/01/15 - Ian McCall (Ayr United) 09/01/15 - Martin Canning (Hamilton Academical) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 23/01/15) 01/02/15 - Brown Ferguson (Stenhousemuir) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed on 02/04/15 to be manager from start of 2015/16 season!) 08/05/15 - Allan Johnston (Dunfermline Athletic) 27/05/15 - Stephen Aitken (Dumbarton) 10/06/15 - Darren Dods (Brechin City) 21/12/15 - Gary Bollan (Forfar Athletic) 21/12/15 - David Hopkin (Livingston) (Caretaker initially, officially confirmed 05/01/16) 08/03/16 - Dick Campbell (Arbroath) 13/05/16 - Ray McKinnon (Dundee United) 20/05/16 - Brendan Rogers (Celtic) 09/06/16 - Neil Lennon (Hibernian) 04/10/16 - Jack Ross (St Mirren) 11/10/16 - Jim Goodwin (Alloa Athletic) 09/11/16 - Dave McKay (Stirling Albion) 04/12/16 - Stewart Petrie (Montrose) 06/12/16 - Gary Naysmith (Queen of the South) 23/01/17 - Stevie Farrell (Stranraer) 15/02/17 - Lee McCulloch (Kilmarnock) (caretaker in theory) 28/02/17 - Stephen Robinson (Motherwell) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 15/03/17) 11/03/17 - Pedro Caixinha (Rangers) 18/04/17 - Neil McCann (Dundee) (technically left position between 29/05/17 & 01/06/17) 08/05/17 - Brian Kerr (Albion Rovers) 29/05/17 - Jim Chapman (Clyde) 30/05/17 - Barry Smith (Raith Rovers) 02/06/17 - Peter Murphy (Annan Athletic) 03/06/17 - Darren Young (East Fife) 14/06/17 - John Robertson (Inverness Caledonian Thistle) 01/07/17 - Billy Brown (Cowdenbeath) 28/08/17 - Craig Levein (Heart of Midlothian) 29/08/17 - Robbie Horn (Berwick Rangers) Vacant - Airdrieonians (Mark Wilson left by "mutual consent" on 17/06/17) Vacant - Falkirk (Peter Houston "mutual consent" on 24/09/17. Alex Smith in caretaker charge) Time for a fresh update to bump this back up and Craig Levein's return to the dugout at Hearts seems the opportune time for it. Still no sign of a formal appointment of new manager at Airdrie, more than 2 months after Mark Wilson left. Update - Berwick confirm Robbie Horn as new manager one day after Levein's appointment. This leaves Airdrie as the only managerless club at the moment. Update - Scotland's 8th longest serving manager, Peter Houston, is shown the door at Falkirk after 3 years 3 months. Alex Smith has been put in caretaker charge. Edited September 24, 2017 by Skyline Drifter 0 Quote Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Skyline Drifter Posted September 25, 2017 Share Posted September 25, 2017 (edited) 30/01/10 - Gary Jardine (Edinburgh City) (initially as co-manager, sole charge from 31/05/12) 07/10/11 - Jim McInally (Peterhead) 30/01/13 - Alan Archibald (Partick Thistle) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 22/03/13) 07/04/13 - Derek McInnes (Aberdeen) (officially confirmed 25/03/13 but didn't take charge for a fortnight) 10/06/13 - Tommy Wright (St Johnstone) 22/01/14 - Gus MacPherson (Queen's Park) 19/05/14 - Jim Duffy (Morton) 27/11/14 - Jim Weir (Elgin City) 05/01/15 - Ian McCall (Ayr United) 09/01/15 - Martin Canning (Hamilton Academical) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 23/01/15) 01/02/15 - Brown Ferguson (Stenhousemuir) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed on 02/04/15 to be manager from start of 2015/16 season!) 08/05/15 - Allan Johnston (Dunfermline Athletic) 27/05/15 - Stephen Aitken (Dumbarton) 10/06/15 - Darren Dods (Brechin City) 21/12/15 - David Hopkin (Livingston) (Caretaker initially, officially confirmed 05/01/16) 08/03/16 - Dick Campbell (Arbroath) 13/05/16 - Ray McKinnon (Dundee United) 20/05/16 - Brendan Rogers (Celtic) 09/06/16 - Neil Lennon (Hibernian) 04/10/16 - Jack Ross (St Mirren) 11/10/16 - Jim Goodwin (Alloa Athletic) 09/11/16 - Dave McKay (Stirling Albion) 04/12/16 - Stewart Petrie (Montrose) 06/12/16 - Gary Naysmith (Queen of the South) 23/01/17 - Stevie Farrell (Stranraer) 15/02/17 - Lee McCulloch (Kilmarnock) (caretaker in theory) 28/02/17 - Stephen Robinson (Motherwell) (caretaker initially, officially confirmed 15/03/17) 11/03/17 - Pedro Caixinha (Rangers) 18/04/17 - Neil McCann (Dundee) (technically left position between 29/05/17 & 01/06/17) 08/05/17 - Brian Kerr (Albion Rovers) 29/05/17 - Jim Chapman (Clyde) 30/05/17 - Barry Smith (Raith Rovers) 02/06/17 - Peter Murphy (Annan Athletic) 03/06/17 - Darren Young (East Fife) 14/06/17 - John Robertson (Inverness Caledonian Thistle) 01/07/17 - Billy Brown (Cowdenbeath) 28/08/17 - Craig Levein (Heart of Midlothian) 29/08/17 - Robbie Horn (Berwick Rangers) 28/09/17 - Owen Coyle (Ross County) Vacant - Airdrieonians (Mark Wilson left by "mutual consent" on 17/06/17) Vacant - Forfar Athletic (Gary Bollan sacked on 18/09/17. Stuart Balmer & Barry Sellars in caretaker charge) Vacant - Falkirk (Peter Houston "mutual consent" on 24/09/17. Alex Smith in caretaker charge) So, Jim McIntyre lasted one solitary day after replacing Peter Houston as Scotland's 8th longest serving manager and the merry go round starts up again. Not sure if the new 8th spot manager, Jim Weir, should be worried! Anyway, a new post with four clubs currently managerless, including Airdrie who have been managerless for over 3 months now. EDITED to add Owen Coyle as the new County manager from 28th September. Edited September 28, 2017 by Skyline Drifter 0 Quote Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Radford Posted September 25, 2017 Share Posted September 25, 2017 Gary Bollan was sacked by Forfar last week. Barry Sellers and Stuart Balmer in temporary charge. @Skyline Drifter 0 Quote Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Skyline Drifter Posted September 25, 2017 Share Posted September 25, 2017 15 minutes ago, Radford said: Gary Bollan was sacked by Forfar last week. Barry Sellers and Stuart Balmer in temporary charge. @Skyline Drifter Thanks, that one completely passed me by (obviously!) 0 Quote Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
btb Posted September 26, 2017 Share Posted September 26, 2017 Less than a year since Jack Ross was appointed by St. Mirren and he's already up to 20th on the list - sign o' the times. 0 Quote Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
The Master Posted September 30, 2017 Share Posted September 30, 2017 (edited) And so the longest-serving manager bites the dust. Gary Jardine has resigned from Edinburgh City after an incredible 7 years and 8 months in the job. http://www.edinburghcityfc.com/2017/09/30/club-statement/ Edited September 30, 2017 by The Master 0 Quote Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
craigkillie Posted October 1, 2017 Share Posted October 1, 2017 Busy weekend. Lee McCulloch sacked by Killie, and Jim Weir leaves Elgin to take over at Forfar, completing the Angus full house in the process. 0 Quote Link to comment Share on other sites More sharing options...
Recommended Posts
Join the conversation
You can post now and register later. If you have an account, sign in now to post with your account.